judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID ROBINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1108
Short Caption:DAVID ROBINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7664-10Filed Date:08/31/2010

Opening Event Date:08/31/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Robinson Y
Holly D. Reed NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/31/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Holly Reed, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Holly Reed, Esquire
09/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (116pgs/Tape) 8/3/10 proc. w/CD
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/13/2010RECORD INDEX
10/13/2010RECORD COPIES
10/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/1/10)
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/03/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) Granted
11/09/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED ROBINSON, DAVID DCDC#328-264 DC JAIL 1901 D STREET, S.E. WASHINGTON DC Zip 20003 - ****CURRENT ADDRESS PROVIDED BY COUNSEL LW
11/10/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL, NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 6, 2010 FILE ANY RESPONSE showing, with specificity any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted and the conviction, order or judgment on appeal affirmed.... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending appellant's response to this order. (BY: ETW)
11/10/2010TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
02/11/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED. See Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967);...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and hereby is AFFIRMED. (FIBEKG) (rl)
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED