judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANE (BOBBY RAY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33389
Short Caption:LANE (BOBBY RAY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145626Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00158
12/03/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00241
12/07/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Evidentiary Hearing on 7/22/98, Trial commencing 7/23/98 and ending on 8/3/98; and 10/20/98 Sentencing. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 98-00266
02/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 07/22/98; 07/23/98; 07/24/98; 07/27/98; 07/28/98; 07/29/98; 07/30/98; 08/03/98; and 10/20/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 99-01288
03/19/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 19, 1999. 99-02000
04/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-02800
05/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: June 18, 1999. 99-03613
06/18/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-05282
06/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-05283
07/20/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-06513
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-01876
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted on the record and briefs this day.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14001
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14120
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14120