Case: 04-88-00565-CV
04-88-00565-CV
11/01/1988
Tax
Harston, Alfred L., and Wife, Harston, Mary E.
Kendall County Appraisal District, Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/15/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/15/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/19/1989 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
07/19/1989 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
07/12/1989 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Authorities Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/28/1989 | Verification Filed | | |
06/22/1989 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Authorities Filed | | |
06/08/1989 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/07/1989 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Authorities Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/07/1989 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed | | |
06/07/1989 | Submitted | | |
06/07/1989 | Submission | | |
06/07/1989 | Submitted | | |
06/06/1989 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Authorities Filed | | |
06/05/1989 | Supplemental Authorities Filed | | |
06/05/1989 | Supplemental Authorities Received | | |
06/02/1989 | Supplemental Authorities Filed | | |
06/02/1989 | Supplemental Authorities Received | | |
05/08/1989 | Submission | | |
01/09/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
01/09/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/09/1989 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
01/09/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/22/1988 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/21/1988 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/30/1988 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
11/30/1988 | Brief Filed | | |
11/01/1988 | No Description Available. | | |
11/01/1988 | No Description Available. | | |
11/01/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/07/1988 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
09/09/1988 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/15/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
216th Judicial District Court
Kendall
Honorable Robert Barton
87-5391
n/a