Case: D-3946
D-3946
07/02/1993
App Writ of Error
BAPTIST MEMORIALS GERIATRIC CENTER
TOM GREEN COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT AND TOM GREEN COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/19/1993 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
07/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
12/07/1993 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
11/03/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
07/22/1993 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/19/1993 | Reply to Response | | | |
07/02/1993 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/07/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TOM GREEN COUNTY APPRAISAL | Respondent | Michael G. Mulcahy Mr. Russell R. Graham |
TOM GREEN COUNTY APPRAISAL DIS | Respondent | Mr. Peter William Low |
BAPTIST MEMORIALS GERIATRIC | Petitioner | Mr. James M. Nias Honorable Roger Rae Leifeste Pat Hall |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-92-00299-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
851 SW2d 938, 04-07-93
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable MARILYN ABOUSSIE
Trial Court Information
119th District Court
Tom Green
Honorable Ira Royal Hart
CV90-1117-B