Case: 01-88-01072-CR
01-88-01072-CR
11/21/1988
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Humphrey, Jerry Don
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/09/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
01/09/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
12/21/1989 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
11/22/1989 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
09/29/1989 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
09/20/1989 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
09/07/1989 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
07/25/1989 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
07/13/1989 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/13/1989 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/06/1989 | Submitted | | |
06/06/1989 | Submission | | |
06/06/1989 | Submitted | | |
05/01/1989 | Submission | | |
03/13/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
03/13/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/13/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/14/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
01/17/1989 | Statement of facts filed | | |
01/17/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
11/18/1988 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
01/21/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/09/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Alan Curry |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Rick Brass |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable MICHAEL T. MCSPADDEN
393,480
$1,000.00