judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NAVARRO (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33388
Short Caption:NAVARRO (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150363Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00159
12/09/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/11/98, 9/18/98. Court Reporter: James Helleso. 98-00302
12/21/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 98-00450
12/21/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 98-00451
01/07/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00078
05/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03892
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04841
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 1999. 99-04841