judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KACEY ALLAN GIBBS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0231)
Case Number:S-07-0231Case Docketed On:10/08/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KACEY ALLAN GIBBS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KACEY ALLAN GIBBS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKacey Allan GibbsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 79
Citation:187 P.3d 862

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/26/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/02/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, six volumes total. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential File; Volume III, Transcripts for both docket numbersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/03/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/20/2008Event - Phone Call. Talked to Pam at the Clerk's office. We never received the certified green signature card back. She stated that they have received the record.EventPhone CallFinal
08/28/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/4/08 by Cheryl Chitwood. (Elaine found card in a stack on her desk)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal