judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1107
Short Caption:ERIC JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1198-10Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Johnson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Christine Pembroke, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christine Pembroke, Esquire
09/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (76pgs/Davis) 8/12/10 proc. w/CD
12/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
02/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/03/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
03/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/09/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief/appendix
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
03/31/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment is hereby AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (rf)
04/06/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
04/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED