Case: 01-14-01009-CV
01-14-01009-CV
12/18/2014
Personal Injury
Grayco Communications, L.P., Grayco-G.P., Inc., and Grayco Cable Services, Inc.
Steven Thomas
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/29/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
03/26/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||||
03/26/2015 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
03/26/2015 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
03/25/2015 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/09/2015 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
03/09/2015 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
02/16/2015 | Clerks record due | | |||||||
02/05/2015 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
01/22/2015 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
01/21/2015 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||||
01/21/2015 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/21/2015 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||||
01/20/2015 | Record due | | |||||||
01/07/2015 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
01/07/2015 | Court fee due | | |||||||
01/07/2015 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
12/30/2014 | Court reporters information sheet sent |
| |||||||
12/18/2014 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
12/18/2014 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||||
12/17/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/08/2014 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
09/19/2014 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||||
09/17/2014 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/29/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/29/2021 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Thomas , Steven | Appellee | Randall O. Sorrels |
Grayco Communications, L.P., Grayco-G.P., Inc., and Grayco Cable Services, Inc. | Appellant | Dustin Sullivan Peter Joseph Bambace |
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 234th District Court
2012-46850
Norma Duarte