judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-96-00538-CV
13-96-00538-CV
10/28/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Alamo Lumber Company, d/b/a Alamo Ready-Mix Concrete
Pena, Tomas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/27/1999Exhibits Disposed
09/27/1999Mandate Issued
08/25/1999Record returned to Court.
04/15/1999Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/17/1999Motion for rehearing filed
02/25/1999Petition For Review Disposed by Sup CtMotion or Writ Denied
12/04/1998Record Sent
12/01/1998Cite for opinions
11/30/1998express fee paid
11/24/1998request for documents
09/08/1998Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
07/07/1998EXT FOR REVIEW DISP BY SUP CTMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/1998ext for pet for review with Sup Ct
06/18/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/18/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/12/1998Filing Fee Paid
06/12/1998Miscellaneous Motion
06/12/1998Motion for rehearing filed
05/22/1998Motion to extend time to file rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/13/1998Extension of time to file Mo. for Rehear
05/13/1998Filing Fee Paid
04/30/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1998Reply Brief Filed
02/05/1998Submitted
02/05/1998Submission
02/03/1998Reply Brief Filed
01/05/1998Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/05/1998Submission
08/01/1997Oral argument requested
08/01/1997Brief Filed
07/17/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/09/1997Additional copies of motion for extension of time
07/08/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/13/1997Oral argument requested
06/13/1997Brief Filed
06/13/1997Case ready to be set
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/14/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/06/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/1997Exhibits Filed
03/05/1997STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
03/05/1997Exhibits received
03/05/1997Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
03/05/1997Statement of Facts Received
02/18/1997Filing Fee Paid
02/18/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/05/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/14/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/12/1996Statement Filed
11/08/1996Statement Filed
10/29/1996Filing Fee Paid
10/28/1996Transcript Filed
10/28/1996Transcript Received
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alamo Lumber Company, D/b/a AlAppellantHon. Linda C. Breck
Hon. Thomas F. Nye
Pena, TomasAppelleeHon. William L. Sciba III
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Calhoun
Honorable Marion M Lewis
92-3-12513