judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEGGY JO KECK v. ROGER LYNN JORDAN

Case Heading (S-07-0201)
Case Number:S-07-0201Case Docketed On:08/28/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:PEGGY JO KECK v. ROGER LYNN JORDAN
Full Title:PEGGY JO KECK, Appellant (Defendant), v. ROGER LYNN JORDAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeggy Jo KeckKathryn J. Edelman
AppelleeRoger Lynn JordanRex O. Arney
Vincent Paul Schutte

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support
Opinion Number:2008 WY 38
Citation:180 P.3d 889 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/09/2007Event - Phone Call - Received call from Rex Arney's office indicating that they had made an entry of appearance in district court and will be counsel for appellee.EventPhone CallFinal
10/15/2007Brief - Appellant. Did not have original signature.BriefAppellantFinal
10/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - received page with original signatureNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/29/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/10/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirm in part and reverse in part. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/18/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/07/2008Order - Awarding costs on reversalOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/9/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal