judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (ANZALONE)

Case Information: 38185
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (ANZALONE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38125
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A384649Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Becker, MaupinCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/14/2001How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker.
07/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-12159
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-12566
08/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Receipt of Copy - Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition). 01-13123
08/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Law Office of Mirch & Mirch associates with Christine Manno as counsel for real party in interest. 01-14249
08/23/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-14353
08/30/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Addendum to Answer to Petitioner's Writ for Mandamus, or in the Alternativve, for Writ of Prohibition. 01-14750
09/28/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File a Reply to the Answer to Petitioners' Writ for Mandamus, or in the Alternative for Writ of Prohibition. 01-16441
10/12/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Objection to Petitioners' Motion for Permission to File a Reply to the Answer to Petitioners' Writ for Mandamus or in the Alternative for Writ of Prohibition. 01-17259
10/30/2001MotionFiled Motion. Petitioner's Motion for Full Court Consideration and Decision. 01-18195
10/31/2001MotionFiled Motion. Amended Petitioner's Motion for Full Court Consideration and Decision. 01-18222
11/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for leave to file a reply, filed September 28, 2001, which has been opposed by real party in interest. We grant petitioners' motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received on September 28, 2001. 01-18591
11/07/2001MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of mandamus, or in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition. 01-16442
11/08/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
11/09/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Response to Petitioners' Amended Motion for Full Court Consideration and Decision. 01-18803
12/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. fn1[We deny, as moot, petitioners' motion and amended motion for full court consideration.] 01-21091
12/14/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the En Banc Court on the papers filed herein.
03/13/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. Young, Agosti, Rose, and Leavitt, JJ. Shearing, J., dissenting. fn45[The Honorable A. William Maupin, Chief Justice, and The Honorable Nancy a. Becker, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 16. EN BANC 02-04499
03/13/2002WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to David W. Wasick for service upon Judge James C. Mahan. 02-04539
03/15/2002WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge James C. Mahan on March 15, 2002. 02-04539
04/03/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Kevin J. Mirch, Ltd.--check no. 7322.
04/03/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: April 1, 2002. 02-05935
04/12/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Christopher G. Gellner. He is removed as counsel and is substituted by Kevin J. Mirch. 02-06609
05/08/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c ). fn1[The Honorable A. William Maupin, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Nancy A. Becker, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 02-08039
05/23/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-08053
05/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.