judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Ronal Lester Peace and Jacquetta L. Peace v. PNC Bank National Association S/B/M to National City Mortgage Co. D/B/A Commonwealth UNoteD Mortgage Company, as the Successor in Interest or Assignee of National City Mortgage Co. D/B/A Commonwealth UNoteD Mortgage, a Subsidiary of National Bank of Indiana, by and through its duly authorized Mortgage Servicer PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., Successor to National City Bank

Case: 10-20-00320-CV
10-20-00320-CV
12/03/2020
Lien
Ronal Lester Peace and Jacquetta L. Peace
PNC Bank National Association S/B/M to National City Mortgage Co. D/B/A Commonwealth UNoteD Mortgage Company, as the Successor in Interest or Assignee of National City Mortgage Co. D/B/A Commonwealth UNoteD Mortgage, a Subsidiary of National Bank of Indiana, by and through its duly authorized Mortgage Servicer PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., Successor to National City Bank
No
6th Court of Appeals
12/09/2020
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
12/09/2020Case stored
12/09/2020Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
12/08/2020Fee paid
12/08/2020Docketing statement filed
12/04/2020Notice filed
12/03/2020Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
10/08/2020Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
09/08/2020Judgment Issued
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/09/2020Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Peace, Jacquetta LAppellantJeffrey S. Davis
PNC Bank National Association S/B/M to National City Mortgage S/B/M to National City Mortgage Co. D/B/A et al AppelleeJonathan Jay Cunningham
Gregory T. Brewer
Christina R. Johnson
Peace, Ronal LesterAppellantJeffrey S. Davis
Trial Court Information
18th District Court
Johnson
Honorable Sydney B. Hewlett
DC-C201600243
Tracie Miller, CSR