Case: 07-19-00369-CR
07-19-00369-CR
10/24/2019
Sexual Assault
Christopher Vidrio
The State of Texas
No
3rd Court of Appeals
10/24/2019
03-19-00664-CR
7th Court of Appeals
10/24/2019
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/21/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||
04/24/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/2020 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||
11/10/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
08/21/2020 | Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant | | |||||
08/14/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Vacated in part and affirmed in part |
| ||||
08/06/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
07/16/2020 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||
05/21/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
05/21/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
04/24/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
04/06/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion granted; further extensions disfavored |
| ||||
04/03/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/09/2020 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
03/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||
03/04/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/03/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||
02/03/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
01/03/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
11/04/2019 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
11/04/2019 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
10/24/2019 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||||
10/24/2019 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||||
09/27/2019 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/26/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/26/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
09/13/2019 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/10/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vidrio, Christopher | Criminal - Appellant | Dal Ruggles |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Margaret M. Moore |
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable Chantal Eldridge
D-1-DC-19-904040
Cindy K. Sympson
Life