Case: 05-17-00361-CV
05-17-00361-CV
04/10/2017
Forcible entry & detainer
Sherry Henry And All Other Occupants
Precision Homes
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/21/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
08/22/2017 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
07/19/2017 | Letter filed |
| |||||
07/12/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
07/12/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
07/11/2017 | Submitted | | |||||
06/12/2017 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
06/05/2017 | Record due | | |||||
05/12/2017 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
05/12/2017 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
04/11/2017 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
04/11/2017 | Fee requested |
| |||||
04/10/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
04/10/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
04/06/2017 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/12/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
09/21/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Homes, Precision | Appellee | Precision Homes |
Henry, Sherry Lynn | Appellant | Sherry Lynn Henry |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Mark Greenberg
CC-17-01443-E
Vikki Ogden