Case: PD-0231-93
PD-0231-93
02/25/1993
PDR Case Type
BRESHEARS, JASON MATTHEW
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/30/1993 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
04/14/1993 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/14/1993 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/30/1993 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
02/25/1993 | PDR FILED | | |
02/25/1993 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/07/1993 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Breshears, Jason Matthew | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Bill Lane |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-91-00824-CR
AFF 11-12-93
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable Norman Lanford
581760