judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-96-00414-CV
08-96-00414-CV
10/28/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse of El Paso, Inc.
Flores, George
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/05/1998Mandate Issued
01/05/1998Mandate Issued
08/28/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
08/28/1997Payment of fee due requested
08/28/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
06/18/1997Submitted
06/18/1997Submission
06/18/1997Submitted
06/04/1997Brief Filed
05/01/1997Submission
03/20/1997Brief Filed
03/20/1997Case ready to be set
03/20/1997Case ready to be set
02/19/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/05/1997Brief Filed
01/06/1997Statement of Facts Filed
12/18/1996Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1996Fee paid
12/04/1996Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
12/03/1996Fee paid
11/27/1996Payment of fee due requested
11/27/1996Transcript Filed
10/28/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/05/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FLORES, GEORGEAppelleeHon. Mark D. Pierce
BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOAppellantHon. Cynthia S. Anderson
Trial Court Information
41st District Court
El Paso
Honorable Mary Anne Bramblett
95-068