judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: 96-1035
96-1035
10/28/1996
See former TRAP 130(D)
DOUGLAS M. JOHNSON
PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/31/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
11/20/1996Reply to ResponseRespondentreply to application for writ of error
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/02/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
02/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
01/02/1997Case forwarded to Court
12/31/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/10/1996Description of document returned to Supreme CourtResent notice of 11/13/96 to Mr. Otha T. Carpenter's updated address.
11/21/1996Description of document returned to Supreme CourtAddress updated for Mr. Otha T. Carpenter; resent notices of 10/28/96 and 10/29/96.
11/20/1996Reply to Responsereply to application for writ of error
11/13/1996Addendum to brief filedCorrected page for the App Writ Err - page 4.
10/29/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 11-04-96
10/29/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 11-04-96
10/28/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/02/1997Case StoredCase stored.1E4 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JOHNSON, DOUGLAS M.PetitionerMr. Otha T. Carpenter
PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPRespondentHonorable Charles W. Seymore
PROTECTIVE LIFE INSURANCE COMPRespondentMr. David B. Edwards
PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANYRespondentMr. Michael Phillips
Court of Appeals Information:
01-96-00312-CV
Appeal dismissed
RULE 90, 08-22-96
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No 4
Harris
Honorable Cynthia A. Crow
605,447