judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-96-00411-CV
08-96-00411-CV
10/28/1996
Other Personal Injury
General Motors Acceptance Corporation/Crenshaw, Dupree & Milam, L.L.P.
Crenshaw, Dupree & Milam, L.L.P./General Motors Acceptance Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/1999Mandate Issued
10/04/1999Mandate Issued
08/27/1999Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
01/27/1999Petition for Discretionary Review
12/02/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/04/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1998Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
10/08/1998Fee paid
10/08/1998Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/05/1998Fee paid
10/05/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/05/1998Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
09/17/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/17/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/11/1998Fee paid
12/15/1997Submitted
12/15/1997Submission
12/15/1997Submitted
12/04/1997Brief Filed
10/23/1997Submission
06/11/1997Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1997Supplemental Transcript Filed
06/06/1997Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
05/30/1997Brief Filed
05/30/1997Case ready to be set
05/30/1997Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
05/30/1997Motion for leave to * filed
05/30/1997Case ready to be set
05/14/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/1997Fee paid
05/02/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/02/1997Payment of fee due requested
04/11/1997Brief Filed
02/27/1997Miscellaneous filing
02/26/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1997Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1997Order entered
02/14/1997Miscellaneous filing
02/13/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/13/1997Motion for leave to * filed
01/23/1997Fee paid
01/21/1997Fee paid
01/14/1997Payment of fee due requested
01/14/1997Payment of fee due requested
01/14/1997Transcript Filed
12/12/1996Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1996Fee paid
11/19/1996Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
10/28/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/04/1999Case StoredCourt has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GENERAL MOTORS ACCEPTANCE CORPAppellantHon. Patricia D. Pope
The Honorable Carlos Villa
CRENSHAW, DUPREE & MILAM, L. LAppelleeHon. John C. Steinberger
CRENSHAW, DUPREE & MILAM, L.L.AppelleeHon. Charles T. Frazier
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
93-9075