Case: 12-23-00236-CV
12-23-00236-CV
09/11/2023
Mandamus
In Re: Trent Brookshire
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/20/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/29/2023 | Case stored | | |||||
11/27/2023 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
11/20/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
| |||||
11/08/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
10/05/2023 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||
10/02/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
09/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/15/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
09/12/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
09/11/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Record filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/29/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/29/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brookshire, Trent | Relator | Mr. Charles E. Baruch Mr. Coyt R. Johnston |
Brookshire, Caroline | Real party in interest | Mr. Michael K. Hurst Mr. John (Jack) F. Walker III Ms. Sara Chelette Mr. Allen F. Gardner Ms. Melissa M. Goodman Mr. Gregory D. Smith Jamie Drillette |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Smith
Honorable Clay M. White
74544-B
Marcie Powell