Case: 05-23-00050-CV
05-23-00050-CV
01/17/2023
Protective Order
Charles Curl
Meghan Smith
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/10/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
09/18/2023 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
07/31/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
07/31/2023 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
07/28/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
07/26/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
07/26/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/26/2023 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
06/26/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/23/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
05/27/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/19/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
05/19/2023 | Notice filed |
| |||||
05/19/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/18/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
05/18/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
04/28/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/27/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
04/08/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
03/31/2023 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
03/29/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
03/27/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
03/27/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
03/24/2023 | Letter issued by the court | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
02/17/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/16/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
02/16/2023 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
02/16/2023 | Letter filed | | |||||
02/15/2023 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
02/15/2023 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
02/12/2023 | Record due | | |||||
01/17/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
01/17/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
01/17/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
01/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/14/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/31/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
10/10/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Smith, Meghan | Appellee | Coyt Randal "'Randy" Johnston Linda Bess S. Aland Charles "Chad" Baruch |
Curl, Charles | Appellant | Thomas Wynne John Hunter Smith |
Trial Court Information
380th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Benjamin N. Smith
380-56945-2022
Karla Kimbrell