Case: 05-23-01320-CR
05-23-01320-CR
12/29/2023
Murder
Lisa Jo Dykes
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/03/2024 | Docketing statement filed | ||||
12/29/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
12/29/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||
12/29/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||
12/18/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
12/14/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
12/13/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/11/2024 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Jennifer Balido John Creuzot |
Dykes, Lisa Jo | Criminal - Appellant | Ronald L. Goranson |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 6
Dallas
Honorable Nancy Mulder
F21-75476
Marissa Garza
Life, TDCJ