judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00162-CV
04-82-00162-CV
04/08/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Shedrock, Jerry Lee
Texas Department of Public Safety
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
09/17/1982Mandate Issued
09/17/1982Mandate Issued
09/15/1982Motion to Reverse and Remand DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1982Motion to Reverse and Remand DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1982Motion to Reverse and Remand filed
07/29/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/29/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/24/1982Brief Filed
05/05/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/05/1982Mot. EOT to file Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/1982No Description Available.
04/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Bond Filed
04/06/1982Appeal Bond Filed
04/06/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/17/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Bexar
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
138,194