judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00063-CV
02-82-00063-CV
04/08/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Stouder, Barbara
Wichita Falls, City of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1983Writ DisposedRefused
03/14/1983Writ Filed
02/10/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/04/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
30th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Calvin Ashley
112368-A