Case: 11-23-00220-CV
11-23-00220-CV
09/29/2023
Contract
Ryan Drilling, LLC d/b/a O'Ryan Drilling and Ryan Hoerauf, individually
B&R Downhole Services, LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
12/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
01/04/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
11/17/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/12/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
10/06/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
10/05/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/29/2023 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||
09/29/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
09/28/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court |
| |||||
09/26/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||
09/21/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ryan Drilling, LLC d/b/a O'Ryan Drilling | Appellant | Tommy D. Sheen Carter Bowers |
Hoerauf, Ryan | Appellant | Tommy D. Sheen Carter Bowers |
B&R Downhole Services, LLC | Appellee | Jared M. Moore Trevor Chilton |
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
Honorable Justin Low, Judge
B-1705-0594-CV
Joel Rodriguez, Court Reporter