judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00488-CR
05-82-00488-CR
04/08/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Boyce Paul Roberson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/26/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/24/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/21/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
01/31/1985Letter issued by the court
06/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/16/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/24/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/24/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/27/1982Reporters record filed
07/27/1982Clerks record filed
06/25/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
04/08/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/16/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Roberson, Boyce PaulCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 204th District Court
F81-4090-PQ
40 years TDC