Case: 05-23-00958-CV
05-23-00958-CV
09/28/2023
Damages
Sarah Kennedy, Jane Braugh, Kathleen Hebert, Lucina Botond, and Roger S. Braugh, Jr., individually and as Heirs of Roger S. Braugh, Sr., Deceased
National Collegiate Athletic Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||
03/04/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
03/04/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/12/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/08/2024 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/06/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/25/2024 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/11/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/05/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/13/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
12/12/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
11/10/2023 | Letter received |
| |||||
11/01/2023 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
10/29/2023 | Record due | | |||||
10/11/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
10/05/2023 | Notice received | | |||||
09/29/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/28/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/28/2023 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
09/28/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/28/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/30/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/03/2024 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
National Collegiate Athletic Association | Appellee | Benjamin Pendroff Victor D. Vital Anna Kalinina Alicia M. Barrs |
Sarah Kennedy, et al. | Appellant | Kirsten M. Castañeda Justin H. Shrader James B. Hartle Lisa Blue Baron |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Nicole Taylor
CC-20-02484-E
Coral Wahlen