judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00007-CR
14-82-00007-CR
01/28/1982
Robbery
Jones, William Dilmus
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1983Mandate Issued
06/02/1983No description available.
05/05/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/20/1983Submission
09/02/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/26/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
05/25/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/28/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM HATTEN
339,128
10 yrs.