Case: 09-23-00405-CV
09-23-00405-CV
12/29/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
George Apanel
Ali Barbar Raza and Syed Ridda Hasnain
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/28/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/28/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/28/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
02/01/2024 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |||||
01/29/2024 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
01/29/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
01/29/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/29/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/05/2024 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
01/05/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||
01/03/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
12/27/2023 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/01/2024 | Status | Court reporters record due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Apanel, George | Appellant | Richard Weaver II Misty A. Hataway-Cone Jonathan William Wu |
Hasnain, Syed Ridda | Appellee | Saad Aziz |
Raza, Ali Barbar | Appellee | Saad Aziz |
Trial Court Information
457th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Vince Santini
22-03-03356-CV
Lorri Lucas