Case: 23-0954
23-0954
11/27/2023
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE RACHEL BUTLER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2024 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Relator | Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of RAchel Butler. | |||||
02/16/2024 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Real Parties in Interest | Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of First Financial Bank N.A., et al. | |||||
02/06/2024 | Motion for Rehearing | Refers to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Rachel Butler. |
| ||||
11/27/2023 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Rachel Butler. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2024 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of RAchel Butler. | ||||||
02/20/2024 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
02/16/2024 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of First Financial Bank N.A., et al. | ||||||
02/13/2024 | Motion to strike disposed | Denied | Real Party in Interest's Motion to Strike Motion for Rehearing is denied. |
| ||||
02/09/2024 | Motion to Strike filed | Motion to Strike Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Candace Emmerich, et al. | ||||||
02/09/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is granted. Motion for Rehearing was timely filed February 6, 2024. |
| ||||
02/09/2024 | Response to Motion filed | Response to Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Candace Emmerich, et al. | ||||||
02/07/2024 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to counsel for real parties in interest regarding motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing. | | |||||
02/07/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | Opposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Rachel Butler. |
| |||||
02/06/2024 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Rachel Butler. |
| |||||
01/29/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is granted. Motion for Rehearing is due February 5, 2024. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
01/26/2024 | Electronic communication sent to Party | E-mail sent to Real Parties in Interest to determine if Response to Motion will be filed. | | |||||
01/26/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Rachel Butler, et al. |
| |||||
01/05/2024 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
12/01/2023 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Candice Emmerich. | ||||||
11/29/2023 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of First Financial Bank N.A. | ||||||
11/28/2023 | Case Record Filed | Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Rachel Butler. | ||||||
11/28/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
11/27/2023 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Rachel Butler. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/20/2024 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Emmerich, Candace | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Kirby Hopkins |
First Financial Bank N.A. | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Wayne C. Watson Ms. Jessica L. Haile Mr. C. Alfred Mackenzie Mr. Gaines F. West II |
Rachel Butler, Individually and as Personal Representative and Heir of the Estate of Jason Butler, and as Next of Friend of K.B. and E.B., Minor Children | Relator | Mr. Sean M. Reagan Mr. Daniel Israel Goldberg |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-22-00324-CV
Cond Grant/Pt
___ SW3d ___, 07-27-23
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable Per Curiam
Trial Court Information
284th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Kristin Bays
21-09-12834-CV