judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00407-CR
04-81-00407-CR
01/29/1982
Burglary
Yener, Jr., Richard William
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsOtherwise Disposed
05/10/1983Brief Filed
04/12/1983Appeal Reinstated
04/12/1983Appeal Reinstated
03/31/1983Brief Filed
02/02/1983Opinion issuedAbated
02/02/1983Opinion issuedAbated
01/29/1982Record Approved
01/07/1982Record Filed
11/10/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
11/10/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann
81-CR-2883
12 Years