Case: 03-22-00320-CV
03-22-00320-CV
06/02/2022
Divorce
Marinda Tong
Waikei Scott Fung
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/2022 | Mandate issued | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
09/09/2022 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
08/10/2022 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||||
07/25/2022 | Motion for rehearing received |
| |||||||
07/18/2022 | Motion for rehearing received | | |||||||
07/13/2022 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
07/07/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/30/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed |
| |||||||
06/29/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/24/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
06/24/2022 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
06/23/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/21/2022 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
06/17/2022 | Letter received |
| |||||||
06/10/2022 | Response filed | | |||||||
06/09/2022 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
06/07/2022 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||||
06/03/2022 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
| |||||||
06/02/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/07/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
12/07/2028 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Fung, Waikei Scott | Appellee | Mr. Waikei Scott Fung |
Tong, Marinda | Appellant | Ms. Marinda Tong |
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Lora J. Livingston
D-1-FM-21-007230
Della M. Duett