judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00008-CR
04-82-00008-CR
01/29/1982
Theft
Parramore, Frank
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/27/1984Mandate Issued
01/27/1984Mandate Issued
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1983Submission
07/27/1983Submitted
03/11/1983Mot. EOT to file Bond DisposedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/09/1983Mot. EOT to file Bond Filed
06/28/1982Requests Oral Argument
06/28/1982Brief Filed
06/28/1982Case ready to be set
06/28/1982Case ready to be set
06/28/1982Case ready to be set
05/28/1982Brief Filed
04/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/31/1982Record Filed
03/29/1982Record Approved
01/29/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
01/13/1982Notice of appeal received
01/13/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
81-CR-3018-B
Ten years