Case: 09-23-00344-CV
09-23-00344-CV
11/06/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Proline Energy Resources, Inc.
Gordy Oil Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/20/2024 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
02/07/2024 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/29/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
11/13/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
11/13/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
11/09/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/06/2023 | Court fee due |
| |||||
11/06/2023 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/13/2024 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Proline Energy Resources, Inc. | Appellant | Jason McLaurin Ghazzaleh Rezazadeh Harry Miles Klaff |
Gordy Oil Company | Appellee | Bradley Nevills Vikesh Patel Jason Klein Matthew McWilliams |
Trial Court Information
75th District Court
Liberty
Honorable Mark Morefield
23DC-CV-00668
Clifton Smith