judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE C. DERRINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0166
Short Caption:ANDRE C. DERRINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:80-CF-0166Consolidated: 80-CF-0458 , 82-CF-1155 , 83-CF-0029
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1263-79Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre C. Derrington N
Randy I. Bellows YN
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Elizabeth J. Branda NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Craig N. MooreYY
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DERRINGTON, ANDRE C. UNITED STATES
09/08/1995APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION
10/13/1995RECEIVED - aple's oppo to aplt's motion to recall mandate
10/17/1995APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to motion to recall mandate.
10/26/1995RECEIVED - aplt response to aple's oppo to aplt's mot. to recall mandate
10/27/1995ORDER - Deny appellant's motion to recall the mandate. F/O that appellee's motion for leave to late-file the lodged opposition is granted and appellee's opposition is filed. FERZPY
10/27/1995APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION is filed
05/12/2003CALENDAR NOTICE SENT