judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN JUSTIN BINGHAM v. JESSICA J. BINGHAM

Case Heading (S-07-0028)
Case Number:S-07-0028Case Docketed On:02/05/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:STEVEN JUSTIN BINGHAM v. JESSICA J. BINGHAM
Full Title:STEVEN JUSTIN BINGHAM, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JESSICA J. BINGHAM, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven Justin Bingham Pro Se
AppelleeJessica J. BinghamDevon P. O'Connell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 145
Citation:167 P.3d 14 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/05/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/05/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. Appellee requests expedited docket.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record of appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/10/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/18/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes; Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/30/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/03/2007Motion - Oral argument - reassignment from expedited docket; received copy of motion on diskMotionOral argument - reassignment from brief only docketFinal
05/08/2007Order - Denying Appellant's motion to reassign case to oral argument docketOrderDenyFinal
09/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/05/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter. Pleadings were discovered in Justice's Chambers today. They were returned by certified mail. Exhibits B & C and J. B.'s Confidential Financial Affidavit.Notice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal