judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHERRI R. SPETEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0253)
Case Number:S-07-0253Case Docketed On:10/30/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:SHERRI R. SPETEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHERRI R. SPETEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSherri R. SpetenJohn Craig Abraham
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Teresa Rachel Evans

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 63
Citation:185 P.3d 25

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/30/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/30/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/17/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/17/2007Event - Phone Call to Counsel for Appellant requesting additional copy of briefEventPhone CallFinal
12/19/2007Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant requesting copy of briefEventPhone CallFinal
12/28/2007Brief - Other - received copy of appellant's briefBriefOtherFinal
01/29/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, pre-sentence report; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Theresa Nelson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - J. Craig Abraham for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/02/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (John Craig Abraham for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Teresa Rachel Nelson, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Nelson for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/09/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/25/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/30/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal