judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN DAVIS V. COZETTE L. THOMAS

Case Information: 10-FM-1127
Short Caption:KEVIN DAVIS V. COZETTE L. THOMASClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO2439-10Filed Date:09/01/2010

Opening Event Date:09/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin DavisNPro SeN
AppelleeCozette Lynette ThomasNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 1, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
10/06/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 8/2/10 (rt. needed)
12/02/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (49pgs/Tape) 8/2/10 proc. w/CD
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/10/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/2/11
02/02/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
02/02/2011RECEIVED - appdx (attached to brief)
02/11/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed with this court on or before March 14, 2011. (JAC)
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/11/2011APPENDIX
03/18/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant was filed with this court on February 11, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before March 14, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC)
04/22/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 18, 2011, which directed appellee to submit her brief within 20 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief has not yet been filed, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW)
04/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
10/04/2011FiledMotion To Consolidate w/11-FM-1190. (Appellant)Denied
10/27/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion To Consolidate w/11-FM-1190. (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Appellee)
12/12/2011LodgedBrief (Appellee)
12/13/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Thompson, Farrell
12/19/2011FiledOrder Granting aple motion
12/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/22/2011LodgedReply to aple's oppo to motion to appeal CPO2439-10. (Appellant)
01/12/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and farrell, Senior Judge.)
02/03/2012FiledMandate
02/28/2012FiledMotion for leave to file petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
05/17/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's pro se motion for leave to file the lodged petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc and the lodged petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc is filed.
05/17/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/17/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc.