judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD MEYER and MIRACLES MEYER v. TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN, individually and TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN d/b/a DESIGN WORKSHOP, a partnership

Case Heading (S-07-0223)
Case Number:S-07-0223Case Docketed On:09/24/2007
Linked To: S-07-0224
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Courts (Title 5)
Short Title:RICHARD MEYER and MIRACLES MEYER v. TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN, individually and TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN d/b/a DESIGN WORKSHOP, a partnership
Full Title:RICHARD MEYER and MIRACLES MEYER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN, individually and TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN d/b/a DESIGN WORKSHOP, a partnership, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantP. Richard MeyerRobert N. Williams
Pamela Treste Parkins
AppellantMiracles MeyerRobert N. Williams
Pamela Treste Parkins
AppelleeTony HattoMark Diehl Sullivan
AppelleeBen SullivanMark Diehl Sullivan
AppelleeDesign Workshop, a partnershipMark Diehl Sullivan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Jurisdiction - Personal, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 153
Citation:198 P.3d 1254

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/24/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/24/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/13/2007Brief - Appellants; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
12/27/2007Brief - Appellees; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
01/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/22/2008Motion - Accept late filing. Plaintiff-Appellants' motion to permit late filing of reply brief; and received reply brief (unfiled).MotionAccept late filingFinal
01/22/2008Affidavit - Other. Affidavit of Pamela T. Harvey.AffidavitOtherFinal
01/23/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant; requested original copy of briefEventPhone CallFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Robert Williams for appellants Meyer; Mark Sullivan for appellees Hatto, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/31/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/05/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel, second request for original signature page to briefEventPhone CallFinal
02/06/2008Brief - Other, received signed original of appellants' reply briefBriefOtherFinal
02/12/2008Order - Granting motion to permit late filing of reply brief.OrderGrantFinal
02/12/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/05/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robert N. Williams for appellants Meyer; Mark Diehl Sullivan for appellees Hatto and Sullivan) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/23/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in partOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Internal - Other - no motion for attorney fees and costs filed within 15 days per W.R.A.P. 10.06.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/08/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/08/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for the appellees; the parties have completely settled the case. He wanted court to know why he did not file a motion for attorney fees and costsEventPhone CallFinal
01/14/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/12/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal