judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INDIA L. BLOCKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1092
Short Caption:INDIA L. BLOCKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1405-10Filed Date:08/17/2010

Opening Event Date:08/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIndia L. Blocker YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Morrison, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Morrison, Esquire
10/21/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 14, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so.(Castillo)
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (65pgs/Tape) 8/16/10 proc. w/cd
10/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/22/2010RECORD INDEX
10/22/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 60 days
12/20/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 3, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
02/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
03/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo)
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
03/21/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
03/21/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
03/24/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTIONS are granted and the lodged brief of appellant and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
03/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
04/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/26/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
05/04/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
07/01/2011JMT GRANT APPELLEE MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE ...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE***
07/01/2011AFFIRMED (GLRDTE)
07/20/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/29/2014FiledMandate