judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1976
A-1976
12/13/1948
Application for Writ of Error
BURTON B. PADDOCK, TRUSTEE IN BANKRUPTCY FOR SIEMONEIT DRILLING COMPANY, INC., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
C. J. SIEMONEIT, C. J. SIEMONEIT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/17/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/09/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/12/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
01/12/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
01/12/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
12/13/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/13/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/09/1949Response to Motion filed
03/23/1949Response to Motion filed
03/20/1949Response to Motion filed
03/17/1949Motion for Rehearing
03/17/1949Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/09/1949Brief on the Merits
01/12/1949Response to Petition
01/12/1949Response to Petition
01/12/1949Response to Petition
01/12/1949Document received (See Remarks)
01/12/1949Document received (See Remarks)
01/12/1949Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1948Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/13/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
United States of AmericaPetitioner
C. J. Siemoneit, et al.Respondent
Burton B. Paddock, Trustee in Bankruptcy for Siemoneit Drilling Company, Inc.Petitioner
C. J. SiemoneitRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information