judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ROBERT NAGLE, JR.: ROBERT NAGLE, JR. v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,

Case Heading (S-07-0222)
Case Number:S-07-0222Case Docketed On:09/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ROBERT NAGLE, JR.: ROBERT NAGLE, JR. v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ROBERT NAGLE, JR.: ROBERT NAGLE, JR. Appellant, (Employee/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Nagle Jr.Sean W. Scoggin
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 99
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/19/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/12/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
12/18/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/09/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/19/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/29/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Combined application and motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs and notice of objection.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/24/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/30/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/29/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal