Case: 04-87-00672-CV
04-87-00672-CV
12/10/1987
Mandamus/prohibition
Partners of Hawaii XL, Relator
Honorable Rose Spector, Respondent
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/20/1988 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
01/29/1988 | Opinion issued | Motion Conditionally Granted | |
01/29/1988 | Opinion issued | Motion Conditionally Granted | |
01/14/1988 | Submitted | | |
01/14/1988 | Submission | | |
01/14/1988 | Submitted | | |
01/06/1988 | Motion for Continuance Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/22/1987 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
12/18/1987 | Motion for Continuance Filed | | |
12/15/1987 | Motion f/l/file Mandamus Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/11/1987 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
12/10/1987 | Writ of Mandamus Received | | |
12/10/1987 | Motion f/l/file Mandamus Filed | | |
12/10/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/20/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
86-CI-12855
n/a