Case: WR-72,702-03
WR-72,702-03
03/21/2022
Original Writ of Mandamus
LUCIO, MELISSA ELIZABETH
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/18/2022 | REPLY RECEIVED | Applicant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/13/2022 | NO MANDATE WILL ISSUE | | |||||
10/13/2022 | SUPP CR FILED |
| |||||
04/25/2022 | MOT STAY EXEC DISP | DENIED |
| ||||
04/25/2022 | OPINION ISSD | Mandamus relief conditionally granted |
| ||||
04/25/2022 | SUBMITTED FILE AND SET WRIT | | |||||
04/25/2022 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |||||
04/25/2022 | WRIT FILED | | |||||
04/25/2022 | ACTION TAKEN | File and set | | ||||
04/18/2022 | REPLY RECEIVED | | |||||
04/12/2022 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
04/04/2022 | ORDER ISSUED | Motion for leave to file held in abeyance W/order |
| ||||
03/21/2022 | MOT STAY EXEC RECD |
| |||||
03/21/2022 | DEATH PENALTY ORIGINAL PETITION RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/13/2022 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
LUCIO, MELISSA ELIZABETH | Applicant | Allen Richard Ellis Tivon Schardl |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
138th District Court
Cameron
07-CR-0885