Case: 05-23-00872-CV
05-23-00872-CV
09/05/2023
Contract
Pure Dentistry PLLC, Prudent Family Dentistry of McKinney PLLC, Sukhraj Khassa and Sarabjit Khassa
Bank of America, N.A.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/10/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Motion filed |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
02/08/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/07/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/10/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
01/10/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
12/18/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
12/11/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
11/30/2023 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/28/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
11/27/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
10/31/2023 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
10/27/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/27/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/06/2023 | Record due | | |||||
09/27/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
09/14/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/11/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/06/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
09/05/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/05/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/07/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/09/2024 | Motion | Miscellaneous motion |
03/11/2024 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bank of America, N.A. | Appellee | Christopher A. Fusselman |
Pure Dentistry PLLC, et al. | Appellant | R. Ritch Roberts III |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Martin Hoffman
DC-17-16115
Antionette Reagor