Case: 21-0650
21-0650
08/03/2021
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE WALMART, INC. AND WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, LLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/23/2021 | Reply Brief | Relator | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. | |||||
11/23/2021 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al, submitted by Dale Wainwright and Elizabeth Bloch of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Austin, Texas. |
| ||||
11/22/2021 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Brief of the Retail Litigation Center, Inc. submitted by Raffi Melkonian of Wright Close & Barger of Houston, Texas. |
| ||||
11/08/2021 | Brief on the Merits | Real Parties in Interest | Real Party in Interests' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Antonio Basco, et al. | |||||
10/04/2021 | Brief on the Merits | Relator | Relators's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. | |||||
08/13/2021 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Brief Received on behalf of Washington Legal Foundation, submitted by Allyson N. Ho of Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP of Dallas, Texas. |
| ||||
08/03/2021 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2022 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
01/28/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
11/23/2021 | Reply Brief | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. | ||||||
11/23/2021 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al, submitted by Dale Wainwright and Elizabeth Bloch of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Austin, Texas. |
| |||||
11/22/2021 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Brief of the Retail Litigation Center, Inc. submitted by Raffi Melkonian of Wright Close & Barger of Houston, Texas. |
| |||||
11/08/2021 | Brief on the Merits | Real Party in Interests' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Antonio Basco, et al. | ||||||
10/21/2021 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Parties in Interest' Brief on the Merits is granted. Real Parties' Brief on the Merits is due November 8, 2021. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Relator's Reply Brief is due November 23, 2021. |
| ||||
10/20/2021 | Response to Motion filed | Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Parties in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. | ||||||
10/19/2021 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to counsel for Relator regarding Real Parties in Interest's Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits. | | |||||
10/19/2021 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Parties in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Antonio Basco, et al. | ||||||
10/08/2021 | Motion to Stay Disposed | Denied | Relators' Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief denied. The petition for writ of mandamus remains pending before this Court. |
| ||||
10/05/2021 | Reply to Response to Motion | Reply in support of Motion for Emergency Relief filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc, et al. | ||||||
10/05/2021 | Call received | Call from counsel for Relator stating that they intend to file a Reply to the Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief by end of day. | | |||||
10/04/2021 | Brief on the Merits | Relators's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. | ||||||
10/04/2021 | Response to Motion filed | Response to Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Jessica Garcia, et al. | ||||||
09/29/2021 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to the Emergency Motion to Stay due no later than 4:00 p.m., Monday, October 4, 2021. |
| |||||
09/28/2021 | Motion to Stay Filed | Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. | ||||||
09/28/2021 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Clerk's Office emailed counsel for real party in interest to inquire whether he would like to file a response prior to filing briefs on the merits. | | |||||
09/27/2021 | Call received | Call received from counsel for relator. | | |||||
08/13/2021 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Brief Received on behalf of Washington Legal Foundation, submitted by Allyson N. Ho of Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP of Dallas, Texas. |
| |||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John M. Masslon II granted. |
| ||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion of Resident Attorney Allyson N. Ho in support of John M. Masslon II's admission Pro Hac Vice granted. | | ||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Cory L. Andrews granted. |
| ||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion of Resident Attorney Allyson N. Ho in support of Cory L. Andrew's admission Pro Hac Vice granted. | | ||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion of Resident Attorney Allyson N. Ho in support of Cory L. Andrews's Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of the Washington Legal Foundation. | ||||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion of Resident Attorney Allyson N. Ho in support of John M. Masslon II's Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of the Washington Legal Foundation. | ||||||
08/13/2021 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Cory L. Andrews filed on behalf of Washington Legal Foundation. | ||||||
08/12/2021 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John M. Masslon II filed on behalf of Washington Legal Foundation. | ||||||
08/05/2021 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion of Resident Attorney in Support of Jeremy M. Bylund’s Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted. | | ||||
08/05/2021 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy M. Bylund is granted. |
| ||||
08/04/2021 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion of resident attorney Wallace B. Jefferson in support of Jeremy M. Bylund's admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Walmart Inc. | ||||||
08/04/2021 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy M. Bylund filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc. | ||||||
08/04/2021 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Antonio Basco, et al. | ||||||
08/03/2021 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. |
| |||||
08/03/2021 | Case Record Filed | Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Walmart, Inc., et al. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/04/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KATHLEEN AILEEN JOHNSON, Individually And on Behalf of the Estate of DAVID ALVAH JOHNSON, Deceased, STEPHANIE MELENDEZ, Individually and As Next Friend of K.M., a Minor, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Jessica Mendez Sandra Martinez Reyes |
Texas Automobile Dealers Association | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Dale Wainwright Ms. Elizabeth G. Bloch |
KARLA ROMERO, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Concepcion Flores |
PAUL JAMROWSKI, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Matthew Ryan McCarley Nabil Majed Nachawati II Ms. Misty Ann Farris Ms. S. Ann Saucer Mr. Stephen Burris |
Washington Legal Foundation | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Dale Wainwright Ms. Elizabeth G. Bloch Ms. Allyson N. Ho Mr. John M. Masslon II Mr. Cory L. Andrews Ms. Elizabeth Kiernan |
JANE DOE 1, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of JOHN DOE 1, Deceased, and As Next Friend of MINOR DOE 1 and MINOR DOE 2, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Miriah Soliz Mr. James B. Kennedy Mr. Robert E. Ammons Mr. Adam A. Milasincic |
National Retail Federation | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Dale Wainwright Ms. Elizabeth G. Bloch |
Texas Association of Business | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Dale Wainwright Ms. Elizabeth G. Bloch |
Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America | Amicus Curiae | |
Dina Lizarde, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of J.R., Deceased, Octavio Lizarde, Michelle Grady | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Robert E. Ammons Mr. Daniel Sorrells Mr. Rogelio Solis Mr. Adam A. Milasincic Miriah Soliz Mr. James B. Kennedy |
PILAR ESTRADA, Individually, and as Next Friend of X.E., a Minor, DORA GONZALEZ, Individually, and as Next Friend of C.G. and D.C., Minor Children | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Michael Alvarez Pavel Savinov Ynhi Huynh |
FRANCISCO DIAZ, EFRAIN GARCIA, Individually and as Next Friend of E.G. a Minor Child, JEREMY AVILA | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Brittany Lopez |
Jessica Garcia, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Guillermo Garcia, Deceased, and as Next Friend of K.G. and G.G. Minors | Real Party in Interest | Mr. David M. Glenn Miriah Soliz Mr. Robert E. Ammons Mr. Adam A. Milasincic Mr. James B. Kennedy |
Retail Litigation Center, Inc. | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Raffi O. Melkonian |
JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, and JANE DOE 5, Individually and on Behalf of the Estates of JOHN DOE 5 and JANE DOE 6, Deceased, JANE DOE 7, JOHN DOE 6, JANE DOE 8, JANE DOE 9, JANE DOE 10, JOHN DOE 7, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Christopher C. Benoit Mr. Adam A. Milasincic Mr. James B. Kennedy Miriah Soliz Mr. Robert E. Ammons Ms. Lynn Anne Coyle |
Ilda Campos, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Leonardo Campos, Deceased | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Robert E. Ammons Mr. Adam A. Milasincic Miriah Soliz Mr. James B. Kennedy Mr. Jesus Alberto Zambrano Mr. Edgar Garcia Jr. |
Walmart, Inc. | Relator | Ms. Laura Enriquez Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson Mr. R. Bruce Hurley Ms. Tracie J. Renfroe Mr. Jeremy M. Bylund Ms. Anna M. Baker |
BRENDA ANCHONDO, RICARDO CORIA and MINOR PLAINTIFF V.A.C., FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ, and RAUL VALDEZ | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Adam A. Milasincic Mr. Robert E. Ammons Miriah Soliz |
ANTONIO BASCO, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Roberto Sanchez |
ROSA BARRON | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Stephen Burris Ms. S. Ann Saucer Nabil Majed Nachawati II Ms. Misty Ann Farris Matthew Ryan McCarley |
ALVARO ATUNA MENA, LINDA DUARTE MORALES, AND MARIA GUADALUPE SOTO | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Stephen Burris Ms. Misty Ann Farris Nabil Majed Nachawati II Matthew Ryan McCarley Ms. S. Ann Saucer |
PATRICIA BENAVIDES, Individually and As Representative of the Estate of ARTURO BENAVIDES, Deceased | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Randall Sorrels |
AURORA BONILLA HERNANDEZ Individually, and As Representative of the Estate of MARIBEL HERNANDEZ LOYA, et al. | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Seth Clark Harmonson Mr. Frederick Leighton Durham III Mr. Stephen W. Stewart Mr. Kirk L. Pittard Mr. Thad D. Spalding Mr. James Muller Mr. Ryan Teel |
Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC | Relator | Ms. Anna M. Baker Mr. R. Bruce Hurley Mr. Jeremy M. Bylund Ms. Tracie J. Renfroe Ms. Laura Enriquez Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson |
Court of Appeals Information:
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
448th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sergio H. Enriquez
2019DCV3471