Case: 13-23-00469-CV
13-23-00469-CV
11/02/2023
Contract
Ashley Galvan
Jason Wendel and Amber Quarles
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
03/07/2024 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
03/07/2024 | Submitted | | |||||||
12/06/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
12/05/2023 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
12/05/2023 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||||
12/05/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
11/30/2023 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||||
11/30/2023 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||||
11/13/2023 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||||
11/13/2023 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||||||
11/13/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||||
11/13/2023 | Letter filed | | |||||||
11/13/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
11/03/2023 | Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal | | |||||||
11/02/2023 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
| |||||||
10/25/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/25/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
08/25/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
07/27/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/22/2024 | Status | Motion for rehearing due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wendel, Jason | Appellee | Hon. John D. Perches Hon. John C. Maher Jr. |
Quarles, Amber | Appellee | Hon. John D. Perches Hon. John C. Maher Jr. |
Galvan, Ashley | Appellant | Hon. James Perez Hon. Matthew Todd Banister |
Trial Court Information
329th District Court
Wharton
Honorable Randy Clapp
CV52084-A
Terri Robason