judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BIANCHINI VS. STATE ENGINEER

Case Information: 33414
Short Caption:BIANCHINI VS. STATE ENGINEERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 8564Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/26/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Allison MacKenzie Hartman Soumbeniotis & Russell--check no. 16240.
12/02/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00222
12/17/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00414
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 21, 1999. 99-00502
04/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/16/99. 99-03268
08/31/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 10/23/99. 99-08170
10/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10532
11/19/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-11533
12/06/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12211
03/17/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 19, 2000. 00-04277
04/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-06293
04/21/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before May 19, 2000. 00-06487
04/21/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Karen A. Peterson withdraws as counsel for appellants. 00-06489
05/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On April 21, 2000, appellants' counsel, Karen A. Peterson, filed a notice of withdrawal of counsel. The proper procedure to withdraw as counsel is to file a motion. In the interest of judicial economy, we treat the notice of withdrawal as a motion for withdrawal, which we grant. Attorney Peterson shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on appellants and to file proof of such service with this court. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. New counsel shall have 40 days from the filing of a notice of appearance to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-08350
05/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Order of the Nevada Supreme Court fild 05/18/00). 00-08761
07/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 23, 2000, appellants submitted a proper person motion for an extension of time to file appellants' opening brief and appendix. We note that appellants have neither sought nor been granted leave to file proper person documents. We deny the relief sought in appellants' proper person motion. 00-12970
08/02/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: Deputy A.G. William J. Frey in place of Deputy A.G. David Creekman. 00-13396
08/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-13397
09/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal. Rather, this appeal shall proceed as a proper person appeal. Having reviewed the documents on file in this proper person appeal, this court has concluded that its review of the complete record is warranted. Accordingly, within 30 days of the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial court record pertaining to this appeal. 00-16248
10/26/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 10/25/00. 00-18943
10/26/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20039
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20149
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. 00-20149