judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0257)
Case Number:S-07-0257Case Docketed On:11/02/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKent Alan Proffit Sr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 114
Citation:193 P.3d 228

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/25/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/29/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/29/2008Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion (Motion in Limine)RecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
03/20/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Corrected)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/09/2008Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion (motion hearings)RecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
05/05/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham M. Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/02/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts, exhibits & jury note/response; Volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/30/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion sent to the warden at the Wyoming State Penitentiary was signed for 10/1/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/16/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/16/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/20/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate sent to warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary was signed for 10/17/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/21/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/20/08 by Donna Elkins.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal