Case: 01-23-00656-CV
01-23-00656-CV
09/05/2023
Injunction
Michael Christopher Tate
Maria Concepcion Landa
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
03/07/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/21/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Extension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions |
| ||||
02/21/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/21/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/08/2024 | Letter issued by the court | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/22/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/22/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/22/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
12/22/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
12/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/27/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
11/22/2023 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk |
| |||||
11/22/2023 | Original exhibits filed | | |||||
11/22/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
10/23/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/23/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
10/23/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/23/2023 | Record due | | |||||
10/10/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
09/26/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||
09/26/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
09/18/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/05/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/05/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
09/01/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/22/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/08/2024 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Appellee | Jessica A. Caird |
Landa, Maria Concepcion | Appellee | Beth Barron |
Tate, Michael Christopher | Appellant | Andrew Taylor |
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 280th District Court
2019-76987
Ehdi Sepulveda